Global patent index - EP 1078700 A2

EP 1078700 A2 2001-02-28 - Method of speed control in order to minimize the formation of inner polygons

Title (en)

Method of speed control in order to minimize the formation of inner polygons

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Drehzahlsteuerung zwecks Minimierung der Innenpolygonbildung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour commander la vitesse de rotation pour minimiser la formation de polygones intérieurs

Publication

EP 1078700 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250266 A

Priority

DE 19941163 A

Abstract (en)

Process for controlling the tube wall thickness in a multi-structured continuous path reducing mill train having devices for measuring the tube wall thickness comprises keeping the whole path constant by computer-controlled changes of the revolutions of the drive motors and reducing the inner polygon formation to a minimum. Preferred Features: The revolution ratios in a roll stand group are increased by changing the revolutions of the drive motors and are reduced in another roll stand group at the same time so that the path of the tube remains constant.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Steuerung der Rohrwanddicke in einer vielgerüstigen kontinuierlichen Streckreduzierwalzstraße mit Einrichtungen zur Messung der Rohrwanddicke hinter der Streckreduzierwalzstraße, einer Rechnereinheit zur Meßwertverarbeitung und einer Einrichtung zur Drehzahlsteuerung der Antriebsmotoren. Dabei wird durch rechnergesteuerte Veränderung der Drehzahlen der Antriebsmotoren während des Rohrdurchlaufes die Gesamtstreckung konstant gehalten und dadurch die Innenpolygonbildung auf ein Minimum reduziert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 37/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 17/14 (2006.01); B21B 37/16 (2006.01); B21B 37/18 (2006.01); B21B 37/48 (2006.01); B21B 37/78 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/78 (2013.01); B21B 17/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1078700 A2 20010228; EP 1078700 A3 20030924; EP 1078700 B1 20051019; AT 306993 T 20051115; CZ 20003105 A3 20010711; CZ 298954 B6 20080319; DE 19941163 A1 20010301; DE 50011358 D1 20051124; ES 2249229 T3 20060401; JP 2001071012 A 20010321; JP 4113662 B2 20080709; RU 2247615 C2 20050310

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160811

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150819

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-09-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50011358

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-09-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50011358

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ANWALTSKANZLEI MEISSNER & MEISSNER, DE

2015-08-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060809

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20060831

2007-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-09-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060720

2006-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-05-17 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2249229

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-03-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060320

2006-02-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20050403954

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2006-01-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060119

2005-12-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-11-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50011358

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-11-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-11-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-11-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2005-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-10-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-10-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-10-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2004-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-06-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040212

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI