Global Patent Index - EP 1078702 A1

EP 1078702 A1 2001-02-28 - Gas flushing device for a metallurgical vessel

Title (en)

Gas flushing device for a metallurgical vessel

Title (de)

Gasspüleinrichtung für ein metallurgisches Gefäss

Title (fr)

Dispositif de rinçage par les gaz pour un réservoir métallurgique

Publication

EP 1078702 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00250283 A

Priority

DE 19941639 A

Abstract (en)

Gas rinsing device has a clamping element formed as a planar plate (5) with arms (6', 7) extending to the right and left and forming a tilting bearing on the one side and a locking site on the other side with stays (8', 12) arranged on the lower side of the metal casing (1).Clamping bolts (18, 18'') are provided to exert an axial force and are fed into the sleeve (19, 19'') arranged on the lower side of the clamping plate. The axial movement of the clamping bolts is limited by an end stop.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Gasspüleinrichtung für ein metallurgisches Gefäß mit einem in einer Öffnung (2) des Metallmantels (1) auswechselbar angeordneten Gasspülstein, an dessen Unterseite ein einen Durchgang aufweisendes Verschlußteil (4) zur Anlage kommt, das mit einem am Metallmantel verschwenkbar angeordneten Haltemittel zusammenwirkt. Hierbei ist an der Öffnung des Metallmantels (1) ein Stutzen (3) befestigt, in dem das Verschlußteil (4) axial verschiebbar angeordnet und das Haltemittel als ebene ver- und entriegelbare und eine Öffnung (43,44) aufweisende Klemmplatte (5,27) ausgebildet ist, die mindestens ein auf das Verschlußteil (4) eine Axialkraft ausübendes axial verschiebbares Element aufweist, dessen Axialbewegung durch einen Endanschlag begrenzt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 1/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1078702 A1 20010228; DE 19941639 A1 20010308; DE 19941639 C2 20010913

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050308

2001-11-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE LU NL

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE LI

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANNESMANNROEHREN-WERKE AG

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010125

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE LI

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI