Global Patent Index - EP 1078723 A2

EP 1078723 A2 2001-02-28 - Process for making building blocks

Title (en)

Process for making building blocks

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Bausteinen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication de blocs de construction

Publication

EP 1078723 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890257 A

Priority

AT 148199 A

Abstract (en)

The method of producing building stones from silicate raw materials involves inserting a silicate mass (2) into a mold (1), and drying the blank. Two opposite-facing sides of the compression mold filled with silicate mass of low bulk density, especially with material mixed with porous-rendering agent, possess openings (7) with matching position and size. Stamps (3) with a cross-section corresponding to the cross-section of the openings are pushed through parallel, continuous ducts in the building stone. The length of the stamps corresponds at least to the distance between the opposite sides. At least some of the stamps are hollow and filled with silicate material with high bulk density and which are inserted into the ducts in the silicate material of low bulk density.

Abstract (de)

Zur Herstellung von Bausteinen, insbesondere Hohlblocksteinen werden Pressformen (1) mit einer silikatischen Masse (2) gefüllt. Es werden Stempel (3), z.B. in Form (1) von Hohlprofilstangen oder Rohren durch Öffnungen in der Form (1) durchgestoßen und damit die Masse (2) im Inneren verdrängt bzw. aus der Form (1) gedrückt. Mindestens einige der Stempel (3) sind hohl und es wird beim Zurückziehen oder Durchziehen derselben aus der Form (1) heraus durch den Hohlprofilstempel (3) hindurch eine druckfeste silikatische Masse (5) von hoher Scherbenrohdichte in das Innere der Form (1) eingebracht. Stempel (9) mit kleinerem Querschnitt können Kernbereiche der so befüllten Kanäle (10) wieder ausstoßen, sodass tragend ausgekleidete Kanäle (10) entstehen. Ebenso kann der Querschnitt der Hohlprofilstempel volle Bereiche aufweisen, bzw. durch Schrägflächen dafür gesorgt sein, dass die injizierte Masse nur einen Teil des gebildeten Hohlraumes im Baustein ausfüllt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 1/00; B28B 13/02; B28B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 1/00 (2006.01); B28B 13/02 (2006.01); B28B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 19/0023 (2013.01); B28B 1/008 (2013.01); B28B 13/021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1078723 A2 20010228; EP 1078723 A3 20021211; HU 0003385 A2 20010528; HU 0003385 D0 20000824; PL 342182 A1 20010312; SK 12652000 A3 20010611

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI