Global Patent Index - EP 1078738 A1

EP 1078738 A1 2001-02-28 - Sheet-fed offset printing machine

Title (en)

Sheet-fed offset printing machine

Title (de)

Offset Bogendruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine pour imprimer des feuilles offset

Publication

EP 1078738 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00100180 A

Priority

JP 21617999 A

Abstract (en)

A sheet-fed printing machine in which a rotation brush (5) approaching the impression cylinder (3) is disposed between the clamp arm (2) and the blanket cylinder (4), an upstream wall (6) and a downstream wall (7) are disposed as to shield an upstream side and a downstream side of the rotation brush (5) and end edge portions of the upstream wall (6) and the downstream wall (7) are brought close to the impression cylinder (3), an inside wall portion (8) shields the upstream wall (6) and the downstream wall (7) tightly, and a suction slit (10) is formed on the inside wall portion (8) connected to a vacuum passage (9) for sucking foreign matter (R) adhering to the rotation brush (5) with the inside wall portion (8) approaching or touching an inside portion of the rotation brush (5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/02 (2006.01); B41F 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1078738 A1 20010228; EP 1078738 B1 20030924; DE 60005448 D1 20031030; DE 60005448 T2 20040701; JP 2001038879 A 20010213; JP 3215094 B2 20011002

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140112

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140112

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-11-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60005448

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140112

2014-08-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60005448

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130117

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121228

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121227

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120124

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SHINKO CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60005448

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG

2003-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-05-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB IT

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010423

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI