Global Patent Index - EP 1078748 A2

EP 1078748 A2 2001-02-28 - Circuit for driving liquid drop spraying apparatus

Title (en)

Circuit for driving liquid drop spraying apparatus

Title (de)

Schaltung zum Betrieb eines Flüssigkeitstropfensprühgerätes

Title (fr)

Circuit de commande d'un appareil à éjection de gouttes de liquide

Publication

EP 1078748 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00307095 A

Priority

  • JP 23444599 A
  • JP 2000229485 A

Abstract (en)

In a circuit for driving a liquid drop spraying or ejecting apparatus, a coil (L1) is provided in series with a resistor (R1) that determines charge characteristics of a charge circuit (12) of a piezoelectric/electrostrictive element (1), thereby making gentle start characteristics when a charge voltage rises. In addition, discharge circuits are provided at two stages. A constant of the second discharging circuit (13b) is set to be smaller than a constant of the first discharging circuit (13a). Coils (L2) and (L3) are provided in series at resistors (R2) and (R3) that determine their discharge characteristics. In this manner, even in the case where a large amount of liquid is sprayed, the driving circuit is capable of smoothly supplying liquid to a pressurizing chamber. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/045

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/055 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14233 (2013.01); B41J 2/0452 (2013.01); B41J 2/04541 (2013.01); B41J 2/04543 (2013.01); B41J 2/04581 (2013.01); B41J 2/04588 (2013.01); B41J 2/14274 (2013.01); B41J 2202/11 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1078748 A2 20010228; EP 1078748 A3 20010516; JP 2001129989 A 20010515; JP 3539365 B2 20040707

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-23 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050201

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011112

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI