Global Patent Index - EP 1078761 A2

EP 1078761 A2 2001-02-28 - Channel structure for an ink jet printhead

Title (en)

Channel structure for an ink jet printhead

Title (de)

Tintenstrahldruckkopfkanalstruktur

Title (fr)

Structure de canaux pour une tête d'impression à jet d'encre

Publication

EP 1078761 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00202870 A

Priority

  • EP 00202870 A
  • EP 99202779 A

Abstract (en)

A channel structure for an ink jet printhead (10), comprising a channel plate (12) having a plurality of substantially equidistant ink channels (14) formed in one surface thereof, with dams (16) being left between the adjacent channels, wherein each channel (14) is covered by a portion (32) of a diaphragm (18) supported on said dams (16) and deflectable into the channel (14) by means of an actuator (28) associated therewith is characterized in that the diaphragm (18) is supported on the dams (16) through spacers (22) which define the exact width and position of the deflectable portion (32), so that larger manufacturing tolerances are allowed for the ink channels (14) in the channel plate. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14274 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1078761 A2 20010228; EP 1078761 A3 20010606; EP 1078761 B1 20081029

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160817

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-10-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090730

2008-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60040637

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-12-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2008-10-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2007-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050621

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050621

2005-08-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050621

2002-02-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB NL

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011206

2001-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI