Global Patent Index - EP 1078834 A2

EP 1078834 A2 2001-02-28 - Normally open purge valve

Title (en)

Normally open purge valve

Title (de)

Normalerweise offenes Entlüftungsventil

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE DE PURGE GENERALEMENT OUVERT

Publication

EP 1078834 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00117424 A

Priority

US 37987499 A

Abstract (en)

A purge valve for expelling liquid contaminants from a fluid conduit which is normally unpressurized but is at times pressurized with a gas which contains liquid contaminants. It has a housing, a diaphragm mounted within the housing, a control chamber on a first side of the diaphragm, an exhaust passage on a second side of the diaphragm and a valve seat surrounding the exhaust passage. The valve seat is positioned so that the diaphragm can seal against it. A spring on the second side of the diaphragm presses it away from the seat. An annular chamber is on the second side of the diaphragm, surrounding the exhaust passage. The annular chamber is open to the exhaust passage when the diaphragm is unseated from the valve seat. The valve has a low impedance flow path between the control chamber and the fluid conduit. The valve also has a high impedance discharge flow path connected to the annular chamber. The high impedance discharge flow path may be connected to the control chamber, connected to the low impedance flow path, or it may be for connection to the fluid conduit. When the valve is connected to the fluid conduit, it is open due to the spring force whenever the fluid conduit is unpressurized so that the liquid contaminant may drain from the valve. When the fluid conduit is pressurized, the diaphragm is pressed against the valve seat so that the valve is closed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60T 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60T 17/00 (2006.01); B60T 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60T 17/004 (2013.01); B60T 17/04 (2013.01); Y10T 137/3105 (2015.04); Y10T 137/7836 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1078834 A2 20010228; EP 1078834 A3 20030219; AU 4875100 A 20010301; AU 756935 B2 20030130; BR 0003462 A 20010612; CA 2314021 A1 20010224; MX PA00008252 A 20020604; US 6170511 B1 20010109; ZA 200003613 B 20010131

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031007

2003-11-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030527

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030325

2003-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI