Global Patent Index - EP 1078835 A1

EP 1078835 A1 2001-02-28 - Inclined station for an aerial cableway

Title (en)

Inclined station for an aerial cableway

Title (de)

Geneigte Seilbahnstation

Title (fr)

Gare de téléphérique inclinée

Publication

EP 1078835 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402214 A

Priority

  • FR 9910781 A
  • FR 0004498 A

Abstract (en)

A cable car station (1) includes means for driving, guiding and supporting the cables (3) and also for guiding and supporting the disengaged vehicles. The station is pivoted above ground (2) at an uphill and embarkation end on a pillar (13) and is supported at the lower end by hydraulic or electrical jacks (15) such that it may take up a variable inclination (a) to assist the cable motor

Abstract (fr)

La gare de téléphérique débrayable comprend une structure de support (1) s'étendant au-dessus du sol (2) pour le guidage et l'entraînement du câble (3) de support des véhicules de transport des passagers ainsi que pour guider et supporter les véhicules qui ont été débrayés du câble (3). Le câble (3) forme une boucle pour amener les véhicules à l'entrée de la gare, des moyens étant ensuite prévus pour déplacer les véhicules débrayés jusqu'à une zone (5) de débarquement et d'embarquement des passagers, la structure (1, 1a, 1b) de support, de guidage, d'entraînement du câble (3) et de support de véhicules débrayés étant allongée dans la direction du câble (3) et étant inclinée pour guider le câble (3) et déplacer les véhicules débrayés suivant une pente pour décélérer ou accélérer les véhicules. La totalité de la structure de support (1) de la gare est inclinée. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 12/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/105 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0125967 A1 19841121 - POMAGALSKI SA [FR]
  • [A] FR 2333684 A1 19770701 - BAUDIN CHATEAUNEUF [FR]
  • [A] "YAN KUNCZYNSKI - 25 JAHRE INNOVATIVER SEILBAHNBAU", INTERNATIONALE SEILBAHN RUNDSCHAU. REVUE INTERNATIONALE DES TELEPHERIQUES,AT,BOHMANN, WIEN, no. 3, 1 June 1990 (1990-06-01), WIEN, AT, pages 5 - 14, XP000142598

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1078835 A1 20010228; EP 1078835 B1 20041229; AT 285920 T 20050115; CA 2316637 A1 20010225; CA 2316637 C 20081021; US 6513440 B1 20030204

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MA03

- Ref Document Number: 285920

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20160216

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160805

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20041229

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20041229

2016-07-13 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20160216

2016-06-30 [REG CH PLX] PATENT DECLARED INVALID FROM DATE OF GRANT ONWARDS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLX

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150709

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150811

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-05-14 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2010-05-14 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2010-05-14 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Ref Legal Event Code: CJ

2010-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: POMAGALSKI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2005-11-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DOPPELMAYR SEILBAHNEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20050920

2005-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2004-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR IT LI

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020404

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH FR IT LI

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010313

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR IT LI

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI