Global Patent Index - EP 1078837 A1

EP 1078837 A1 2001-02-28 - Side frame - bolster interface for railcar bogie assembly

Title (en)

Side frame - bolster interface for railcar bogie assembly

Title (de)

Schnittstelle zwischen Längsträger und Wiege eines Drehgestells eines Eisenbahnwagens

Title (fr)

Interface entre le bâti latéral et la traverse danseuse d'un bogie d'un véhicule ferroviaire

Publication

EP 1078837 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99306591 A

Priority

US 13702199 A

Abstract (en)

A three-piece railcar bogie assembly has two side frames (103,105) and a bolster extending (16) extending between the side frames (103,105). Each side frame (103,105) has spaced columns defining an opening which receives one end of the bolster (16). Each side frame (103,105) also has forward and rearward lugs (152,53,100,102) at the columns, both on the inboard side and the outboard side. Each side frame lug has a stop surface that is aligned in a facing relationship with a stop surface of one bolster gib (50,51,52,53). There is a gap between the opposed side frame lug and bolster gib stop surfaces. The gap distance is limited to limit the bogie warp angle. The neighboring side frame lugs (52,53,100,102) and bolster gibs (50,51,52,53) may be sized, shaped and spaced so that the bogie warp angle may be limited to an angle of less than two degrees. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/122 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1078837 A1 20010228

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010829

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-02 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: 20010228

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI