Global Patent Index - EP 1078838 A1

EP 1078838 A1 2001-02-28 - Running gear for a rail vehicle transporting loads

Title (en)

Running gear for a rail vehicle transporting loads

Title (de)

Fahrgestell für ein schienengebundenes Fahrzeug zum frei verfahrbaren Transportieren von Lasten

Title (fr)

Train de roulement pour un véhicule ferroviaire transportant des charges

Publication

EP 1078838 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00250267 A

Priority

DE 19941119 A

Abstract (en)

The wheel unit has several wheel sets capable of passing round curves, running in the rails on bogies. The wheel sets (2-5) are relieved by at least one supporting wheel set (7) with two wheels, which can be raised and lowered on the vehicle. Its support wheels can be lowered from a rest position above the rails to a working position in which each wheel acts on the rail at a pressure which can be set.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Fahrgestell für ein schienengebundenes Fahrzeug zum Transportieren frei verfahrbarer Lasten, insbesondere das Fahrgestell eines Eisenbahnkranes, mit mehreren in Drehgestellen aufgenommenen kurvengängigen Radsätzen, die in einem oder mehreren Fahrwerksrahmen gelagert auf den Fahrschienen abrollen. Hierbei ist zur Entlastung der Radsätze (2 bis 5) mindestens ein aus zwei Stützrädern (7a) bestehender Stützradsatz (7) vorgesehen, der heb- und senkbar am Fahrzeug befestigt ist und dessen Stützräder (7a) aus einer Ruhestellung oberhalb der Schiene (13) in eine Wirkstellung absenkbar sind, in der jedes Stützrad (7a) mit einstellbarem Druck auf einem Gleis der Schiene (13) aufliegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61K 5/02; B61D 15/02; B61F 5/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 15/00 (2006.01); B61D 15/02 (2006.01); B61F 3/10 (2006.01); B61F 5/36 (2006.01); B61K 5/02 (2006.01); B66C 23/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 15/02 (2013.01); B61F 3/10 (2013.01); B61F 5/36 (2013.01); B61K 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1078838 A1 20010228; DE 19941119 A1 20010322; DE 19941119 C2 20021107; JP 2001089077 A 20010403; US 6453825 B1 20020924

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070927

2003-12-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GOTTWALD PORT TECHNOLOGY GMBH

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010115

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI