Global Patent Index - EP 1078849 A2

EP 1078849 A2 2001-02-28 - Arrangement for storing and conveying items to be placed inside torpedo tubes

Title (en)

Arrangement for storing and conveying items to be placed inside torpedo tubes

Title (de)

Stau- und Transporteinrichtung für in Torpedorohre zu verbringende Körper

Title (fr)

Arrangement pour stocker et transporter des éléments disposés à l'intérieur de tubes lance-torpilles

Publication

EP 1078849 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117071 A

Priority

DE 19940105 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19940105C1] The frame (6) is secured to the base (5) and a midfloor (4) via shock absorbing elements (8) which are pre-tensioned higher than operational forces arising without shock effect. Frame (6) and its containers (7) are connected to the base (5) and midfloor (4) by both horizontal and vertical absorbers (8). The shock absorbers consist of various types of spring and in shock automatically re-set to starting position and in so doing prevent any change in position of the caliber axis between stowage system and torpedo tubes. The axis is similarly retained unchanged under service loading.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Stau- und Transporteinrichtung für in Torpedorohre zu verbringende Körper wie Torpedos, Minen, Flugkörper u.s.w. auf U-Booten. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, die Schockbeanspruchungen auf die Körper, die in die Torpedorohre verbracht werden, herabzusetzen. Die Aufgabe wird dadurch gelöst, daß ein Gerüst (6) an einem Fundament (5) und einem Zwischendeck (4) befestigt ist und zwischen Gerüst (6) und dem Fundament (5) und dem Zwischendeck (4) vorgespannte elastische Schockdämpfungselemente (8,9,10) angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63G 8/32; F41A 9/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63G 8/32 (2006.01); F41F 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41F 3/08 (2013.01); B63G 8/32 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19940105 C1 20000831; EP 1078849 A2 20010228; EP 1078849 A3 20020814; EP 1078849 B1 20030924

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-26 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 50003809

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150206

2015-02-06 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 50003809

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-02-26 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20140219

2014-02-26 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: TD

- Effective date: 20140219

2014-02-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP MARINE SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50003809

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140103

2014-02-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50003809

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BRESSEL UND PARTNER MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20140103

2014-01-31 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP MARINE SYSTEMS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20131230

2014-01-31 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Ref Legal Event Code: CJ

- Effective date: 20131230

2014-01-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50003809

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BRESSEL UND PARTNER, DE

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040104

2004-01-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50003809

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020923

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI