Global patent index - EP 1078860 A1

EP 1078860 A1 2001-02-28 - Containers with variable volume

Title (en)

Containers with variable volume

Title (de)

Behälter mit veränderlichem Volumen

Title (fr)

Récipients à volume variable

Publication

EP 1078860 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00202933 A

Priority

  • EP 96902518 A
  • NZ 27048895 A

Abstract (en)

A container (10) of variable volume comprises an inner flexible member (1) substantially enclosed in a number of interlocking outer sleeves (3, 14). The volume of the container (10) can be varied by moving at least one outer sleeve (3, 14) relative to another outer sleeve (3, 14). Means for moving the outer sleeves (14, 3) to vary the volume of the container (10) include rotating screw-threaded outer sleeves (3, 14), moving an outer sleeve relative to another by means of a ratchet, or by using multi-level bayonet type connection. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 6/16; B65D 8/14; B65D 51/16; B65D 77/06; B65D 81/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 6/10 (2006.01); B65D 6/16 (2006.01); B65D 8/14 (2006.01); B65D 21/08 (2006.01); B65D 35/28 (2006.01); B65D 77/06 (2006.01); B65D 81/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/24 (2013.01); B65D 11/04 (2013.01); B65D 21/086 (2013.01); B65D 77/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9625337 A1 19960822; AT 207441 T 20011115; AU 4680096 A 19960904; CA 2212876 A1 19960822; CN 1077066 C 20020102; CN 1177325 A 19980325; CN 1295011 A 20010516; DE 69616287 D1 20011129; EP 0809590 A1 19971203; EP 0809590 A4 19980527; EP 0809590 B1 20011024; EP 1078860 A1 20010228; JP H11500089 A 19990106; MX 9706444 A 19980731; ZA 9601142 B 19961023

INPADOC legal status

2009-12-16 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19U

- Effective date: 20040602

2009-12-16 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D18D

2005-03-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040901

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020117

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011112

2002-01-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-02-28 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 809590

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE