Global Patent Index - EP 1078863 A1

EP 1078863 A1 2001-02-28 - Self closing valve manufacturing method

Title (en)

Self closing valve manufacturing method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines selbstschliessenden Ventils

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'une soupape à fermeture automatique

Publication

EP 1078863 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00124846 A

Priority

  • DE 29703275 U
  • EP 98912395 A

Abstract (en)

The membrane (5) has a closure cover (7) and a retainer flange (10) joined to the cover via a connector wall (8) to form a pot-shaped arrangement. At least one slot opening (16) in the cover is intermittently filled in along its length. Preferably three slots, all filled in intermittently, extend outwards in a radial direction from the middle of the cover to form a star-shaped pattern. A bridging section of cover material is left behind to fill in part of the slot and divide it into two sections which have different lengths.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Herstellung eines selbstschließenden Ventils (5) mit folgenden Verfahrensschritten: Einspritzen des Kunststoffmaterials in eine Form, durch welche eine einstückiger Ventilkörper bestehend aus Membran (7), Verbindungswand (8) und Halteabschnitt (10) geformt wird; Entnehmen des Ventilkörpers aus dieser Form; Umstülpen des Ventilkörpers, indem die Membran )7) durch den von der Verbindungswand umgebenen Hohlraum geführt wird; Einbringen einer Schlitzung in die Membran (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/2031 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29703275 U1 19980625; AT 229458 T 20021215; AT 256604 T 20040115; AU 6725198 A 19980918; EP 0963323 A1 19991215; EP 0963323 B1 20021211; EP 1078863 A1 20010228; EP 1078863 B1 20031217; ES 2189147 T3 20030701; ES 2212956 T3 20040816; WO 9838102 A1 19980903

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-09-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2212956

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-03-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59810488

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-12-17 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0963323

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020116

2001-11-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010821

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-02-28 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 963323

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI