Global Patent Index - EP 1078874 A2

EP 1078874 A2 2001-02-28 - Method and device for transporting stacks of flat objects, in particular plastic bags or similar

Title (en)

Method and device for transporting stacks of flat objects, in particular plastic bags or similar

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Abtransportieren von gestalpelten flachen Gegenständen, insbesondere Taschen oder dergleichen aus Kunststoffolie

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour transporter des piles d'objets plats, en particulier des sacs plastiques ou similaires

Publication

EP 1078874 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114369 A

Priority

DE 19940637 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves acquiring the objects with a gripper hand (2) of a robot (1) and transporting them to the unloading station in the gripper hand. The stack is picked up by the gripper hand near the stacking device (4), held clamped by the hand and folded at least once before the folded stack is deposited in the unloading station after releasing the clamp. An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for transporting stacked flat plastic foil objects, especially pockets or similar.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Abtransportieren von gestapelten flachen Gegenständen, insbesondere Taschen oder dergleichen aus Kunststoffolie von einer Stapeleinrichtung (4) zu einer Entladestation (3) mit Hilfe einer Greiferhand (2) eines programmgesteuerten Roboters (1), der zum Zwecke einer schnellen und einwandfreien Ablage der Stapel (6) in einen Aufnahmebehälter (25) den Stapel mit Hilfe der Greiferhand (2) wenigstens einmal faltet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 31/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/30 (2006.01); B65H 45/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/04 (2013.01); B65H 31/30 (2013.01); B31B 2219/926 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4224 (2013.01); B65H 2404/3141 (2013.01); B65H 2555/31 (2013.01); B65H 2701/191 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3834115 C1 19900503

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1078874 A2 20010228; EP 1078874 A3 20011017; DE 19940637 A1 20010308; US 6412253 B1 20020702

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040123

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030110

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011019

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI