Global patent index - EP 1078876 A2

EP 1078876 A2 2001-02-28 - Elevator system having an improved hoisting machine

Title (en)

Elevator system having an improved hoisting machine

Title (de)

Aufzugssystem mit verbessertem Hebezeug

Title (fr)

Système d'ascenseur avec machinerie de levage améliorée

Publication

EP 1078876 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00114098 A

Priority

JP 24053899 A

Abstract (en)

In a hoisting machine of a elevator system, one side of a ring-shaped recessed base member is formed open. A shaft originates from the bottom portion of the base member at right angle within the base member. A support plate is provided so as to extend across the opening of the base member, and a brake is mounted on the support plate. A stator winding is provided along the interior surface of the base member in the vicinity of the opening. A ring-shaped recessed rotator is rotatably supported by a shaft with in the base member, and a driving sheave is formed in the outer periphery of the rotator in the vicinity of the bottom portion. Further, an armature is provided on the outer periphery of the rotator defining the open side thereof. A brake surface is formed along the internal peripheral surface of the rotator on the opposite side of the armature. The configuration prevents adherence of rope oil to the brake and the brake surface, which would otherwise be caused when the rope oil splashes from the main cable. The hoisting machine is provided at the ceiling in a hoistway and is capable of readily maintaining stable braking action of the hoisting machine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/04; B66B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/00 (2006.01); B66B 11/00 (2006.01); B66B 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/0438 (2013.01); B66B 11/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1078876 A2 20010228; EP 1078876 A3 20050406; EP 1078876 B1 20061227; CN 100515904 C 20090722; CN 101486428 A 20090722; CN 101486428 B 20120328; CN 1226177 C 20051109; CN 1286210 A 20010307; CN 1749145 A 20060322; DE 00114098 T1 20050331; DE 60032547 D1 20070208; DE 60032547 T2 20071004; DE 60043755 D1 20100311; DE 60043906 D1 20100408; EP 1702878 A1 20060920; EP 1702878 B1 20100120; EP 1702879 A1 20060920; EP 1702879 B1 20100224; JP 2001063933 A 20010313; JP 4191333 B2 20081203; TW 503212 B 20020921

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-17 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 60032547

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061227

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070817

2007-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070928

2007-08-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2007-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2007-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60032547

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-02-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL

2006-12-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061227

2006-12-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL

2006-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-12-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-04-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-03-31 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

2005-01-21 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

2005-01-03 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: TCNL

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000707

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI