Global Patent Index - EP 1078879 A1

EP 1078879 A1 2001-02-28 - Beverage dispenser with peristaltic pump

Title (en)

Beverage dispenser with peristaltic pump

Title (de)

Getränkespender mit Peristaltikpumpe

Title (fr)

Distributeur de boissons avec pompe péristaltique

Publication

EP 1078879 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99116973 A

Priority

EP 99116973 A

Abstract (en)

In a beverage dispenser, a beverage material-supplying tube extending from BIB (3) is squeezed by a pump (5) to draw the beverage material from BIB and then to extrude the beverage material to a nozzle (6). The beverage dispenser has a sensor (13) provided adjacent to the beverage material-supplying tube (4) and a processor into which the output of the sensor is input. The sensor calculates a moving average value using, as a data source, highest signal values among sampled signals obtained by multipoint sampling of analog signals output from the sensor, and, based on the magnitude of a change in the moving average value, a decision is made on whether or not the beverage material has been sold out. By virtue of the above construction, the sold-out of the beverage material in BIB can be accurately detected. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/12 (2006.01); B67D 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/1211 (2013.01); B67D 1/1247 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H06211299 A 19940802 - NIPPON KOKA COLA KK, et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1078879 A1 20010228; EP 1078879 B1 20031119; DE 69912945 D1 20031224; DE 69912945 T2 20040422

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070827

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050824

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060827

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060827

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050825

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050824

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040820

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69912945 P 20031224

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021219

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990827

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI