Global Patent Index - EP 1078973 B1

EP 1078973 B1 2002-11-27 - Stabilised monomer composition

Title (en)

Stabilised monomer composition

Title (de)

Stabilisierte Monomerzusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Composition de monomère stabilisée

Publication

EP 1078973 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00117696 A

Priority

DE 19940623 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1078973A2] A stable monomer composition (I) comprises ethylenic unsaturated monomer(s) and a stabilizer. The stabilizer comprises a combination of N,N-diethylhydroxylamine (Ia) and N-nitroso-N-phenylhydroxylamine (Ib). An Independent claim is also included for the preparation of (I) by mixing the stabilizer with the ethylenic unsaturated monomer(s).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09K 15/20; C07B 63/04; C07C 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07B 63/04 (2006.01); C07C 57/075 (2006.01); C07C 67/62 (2006.01); C07C 69/54 (2006.01); C07C 243/04 (2006.01); C09K 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09K 15/20 (2013.01); C07B 63/04 (2013.01); C07C 67/62 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C07C 67/62 + C07C 69/54

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1078973 A2 20010228; EP 1078973 A3 20010307; EP 1078973 B1 20021127; DE 19940623 A1 20010301; JP 2001089417 A 20010403; US 6706209 B1 20040316

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090817

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090817

2010-03-31 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-03-17 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20100223

2010-03-17 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20100223

2010-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ROHM G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080822

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080813

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000810 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB NL

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020425

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE GB NL

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010620

2001-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROEHM GMBH & CO. KG

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB NL

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI