Global Patent Index - EP 1078976 A1

EP 1078976 A1 2001-02-28 - Process for the production of oils with high viscosity index

Title (en)

Process for the production of oils with high viscosity index

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Ölen mit erhöhtem Viskositätsindex

Title (fr)

Procédé de production d'huiles ayant un indice de viscosité élevé

Publication

EP 1078976 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402205 A

Priority

FR 9910769 A

Abstract (en)

The process enables the recovery of oil fractions graded according to thier viscosity indices by direct treatment of petroleum fractions. Middle distillates can also be recovered. A process for the production of oils of high viscosity index(VI) from a charge consisting of compounds of boiling points higher than 300 degrees C., comprises (a) reaction of the charge, or a mixture of charge with a re-cycled fraction from stage (c), with hydrogen in the presence of a catalyst comprising an amorphous non-zeolitic matrix and a group VIII metal or metal compound and/or a group VIB metal ; (b) fractionation of the effluent from (a) to separate off a residue of oils mainly containing constituents of VI higher than that of the charge ; and (c) fractionation of the oil residues from (b) by thermal diffusion, the oils being separated according to their viscosity.

Abstract (fr)

Le procédé permettant d'obtenir des huiles d'indices de viscosité élevés, à partir de distillats de pétrole ou d'effluents d'unité de conversion, comprend les étapes suivantes : a) l'hydrotraitement catalytique de la charge, en présence d'hydrogène et d'un catalyseur non zéolithique, b) le fractionnement d'au moins une partie de l'effluent obtenu à l'étape a) ou à l'étape d) décrite ci-après, en un résidu d'huiles, c) le fractionnement par diffusion thermique d'au moins une partie du résidu d'huiles obtenu à l'étape b), en fractions d'huiles de compositions et d'indices de viscosité différents, L'étape b) peut être précédée d'une étape d) d'hydrocraquage de l'effluent obtenu à l'étape a), en présence d'hydrogène et d'un catalyseur zéolithique. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 67/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 67/14 (2006.01); C10G 21/16 (2006.01); C10G 45/04 (2006.01); C10G 45/46 (2006.01); C10G 45/64 (2006.01); C10G 47/16 (2006.01); C10G 47/18 (2006.01); C10G 65/12 (2006.01); C10G 67/02 (2006.01); C10G 67/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 67/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB GR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1078976 A1 20010228; FR 2797883 A1 20010302; FR 2797883 B1 20041217; JP 2001098281 A 20010410; KR 100729285 B1 20070618; KR 20010096462 A 20011107; US 6783661 B1 20040831

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060214

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031229

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB GR IT NL

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010828

2001-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRIOT, PATRICK

2001-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GUERET, CHRISTOPHE

2001-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HIPEAUX, JEAN-CLAUDE

2001-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BENAZZI, ERIC

2001-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARION, PIERRE

2001-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BILLON, ALAIN

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB GR IT NL

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI