Global Patent Index - EP 1078989 A8

EP 1078989 A8 2001-04-25 - Method for producing L-glutamic acid by fermentation accompanied by precipitation

Title (en)

Method for producing L-glutamic acid by fermentation accompanied by precipitation

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von L-Glutaminsäure durch Fermentation und in Verbindung mit Fällung

Title (fr)

Procédé de préparation d'acide l-glutamique par fermentation et accompagné d'une précipitation

Publication

EP 1078989 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 00117807 A

Priority

  • JP 23480699 A
  • JP 2000078771 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1078989A2] A microorganism which can metabolize a carbon source at a specific pH in a liquid medium containing L-glutamic acid at a saturation concentration and the carbon source, and has ability to accumulate L-glutamic acid in an amount exceeding the amount corresponding to the saturation concentration in the liquid medium at the pH; and a method for producing L-glutamic acid by fermentation, which comprises culturing the microorganism in a liquid medium of which pH is adjusted to a pH at which L-glutamic acid is precipitated, to produce and accumulate L-glutamic acid and precipitate L-glutamic acid in the medium.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/53; C12N 15/60; C12N 1/21; C12N 1/20; C12P 13/14; C12N 9/88; C12N 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 1/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/20 (2006.01); C12N 9/06 (2006.01); C12N 9/88 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/53 (2006.01); C12N 15/60 (2006.01); C12P 13/14 (2006.01); C12R 1/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/0016 (2013.01); C12N 9/88 (2013.01); C12P 13/14 (2013.01); C12R 1/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1078989 A2 20010228; EP 1078989 A3 20011010; EP 1078989 A8 20010425; EP 1078989 B1 20060802; AT 335081 T 20060815; AU 5345200 A 20010222; BR 0003695 A 20010605; BR 0003695 B1 20110823; CN 100379871 C 20080409; CN 101230366 A 20080730; CN 101230366 B 20110907; CN 1292421 A 20010425; DE 60029701 D1 20060914; DE 60029701 T2 20070809; DE 60029701 T8 20080103; ES 2269047 T3 20070401; ID 26915 A 20010222; JP 2001333769 A 20011204; JP 4427878 B2 20100310; KR 100799469 B1 20080130; KR 100866479 B1 20081111; KR 20010050133 A 20010615; KR 20070106959 A 20071106; KR 20080083103 A 20080916; KR 20090127855 A 20091214; MY 129239 A 20070330; PE 05182001 A1 20010510; PL 341974 A1 20010226; RU 2261272 C2 20050927; TW 200427836 A 20041216; TW I250211 B 20060301; US 2005227334 A1 20051013; US 2007134773 A1 20070614; US 2009162907 A1 20090625; US 7015010 B1 20060321; US 7208296 B2 20070424; US RE42350 E 20110510

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160812

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160809

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160711

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150818

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150818

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140813

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060802

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060818

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: AJINOMOTO CO., INC.

- Free text: AJINOMOTO CO., INC.#15-1, KYOBASHI 1-CHOME, CHUO-KU#TOKYO 104 (JP) -TRANSFER TO- AJINOMOTO CO., INC.#15-1, KYOBASHI 1-CHOME, CHUO-KU#TOKYO 104 (JP)

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061103

2007-07-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070503

2007-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2269047 T3

2007-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070102

2006-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2006-11-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061102

2006-11-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061102

2006-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60029701 P 20060914

2006-09-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2006-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060818

2006-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-08-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-08-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060802

2006-08-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060802

2006-08-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060802

2004-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040112

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020322

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 15/53 A, 7C 12N 15/60 B, 7C 12N 1/21 B, 7C 12N 1/20 B, 7C 12P 13/14 B, 7C 12N 9/88 B, 7C 12N 9/06 B, 7C 12R 1/01 B, 7C 12N 1/20 J, 7C 12R 1:01 J, 7C 12R 1:425 J

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: IZUI, HIROSHI, C/O AJINOMOTO CO., INC.

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MORIYA, MIKA, C/O AJINOMOTO CO., INC.

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HIRANO, SEIKO, C/O AJINOMOTO CO., INC.

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARA, YOSHIHIKO, C/O AJINOMOTO CO., INC.

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ITO, HISAO, C/O AJINOMOTO CO., INC.

2001-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MATSUI, KAZUHIKO C/O ZAO AGRI

2001-03-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AJINOMOTO CO., INC.

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI