Global Patent Index - EP 1078991 A8

EP 1078991 A8 2001-04-25 - Methods for producing L-amino acids

Title (en)

Methods for producing L-amino acids

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von L-Aminosäuren

Title (fr)

Procédé de préparation d'acide L-aminique

Publication

EP 1078991 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 00117660 A

Priority

JP 23034799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1078991A2] A methane-utilizing microorganism capable of producing L-amino acid, for example, bacteria belonging to type I, type X or type II in the taxonomic categorization methane-utilizing bacteria such as Methylomonas albus, Methylococcus capsulatus and Methylosinus trichosporium, is cultivated in a culture medium in contact with gas containing methane which is the main source of carbon, to allow the L-amino acid to be produced and accumulated in the medium, and the L-amino acid is collected from the medium.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12P 13/04; C12N 1/00; C12N 1/21; C12N 15/63

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/01 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/20 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 13/04 (2006.01); C12P 13/06 (2006.01); C12P 13/08 (2006.01); C12P 13/10 (2006.01); C12P 13/12 (2006.01); C12P 13/14 (2006.01); C12P 13/20 (2006.01); C12P 13/22 (2006.01); C12P 13/24 (2006.01); C12R 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12R 1/26 (2013.01); C12P 13/04 (2013.01); C12P 13/08 (2013.01); C12P 13/12 (2013.01); C12R 1/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1078991 A2 20010228; EP 1078991 A3 20020102; EP 1078991 A8 20010425; JP 2001120292 A 20010508; US 2003166174 A1 20030904; US 7192747 B2 20070320

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080806

2008-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080326

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ONO, YUKIKO, C/O AJINOMOTO CO., INC.

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YASUEDA, HISASHI, C/O AJINOMOTO CO., INC.

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAWAHARA, YOSHIO, C/O AJINOMOTO CO., INC.

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SUGIMOTO, SHINICHI, C/O AJINOMOTO CO., INC.

2001-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AJINOMOTO CO., INC.

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI