Global patent index - EP 1078994 A2

EP 1078994 A2 2001-02-28 - Process and device for manufacturing fine wire

Title (en)

Process and device for manufacturing fine wire

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Feindraht

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication de fil fin

Publication

EP 1078994 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116541 A

Priority

DE 19940845 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19940845C1] Fine wire production, using the same furnace and/or cooling system for pre-annealing and drawn wire hardening treatment, is new. Independent claims are also included for the following: (i) a furnace system for use in the above process, comprising a furnace chamber containing a heat distribution block designed for uniform wire heating; (ii) a cooling system for use in the above process, comprising a fluidization chamber containing a flowable material such as sand, a fluid feeder for feeding a fluidizing fluid into the fluidization chamber and an electromagnetic wave radiation device for heating the flowable material in the fluidization chamber; and (iii) equipment for carrying out the above process, comprising the above furnace system and/or cooling system.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Herstellen von Feindraht, insbesondere Kratzendraht, bei dem ein ggf. bereits behandeltes, insbesondere gezogenes, Draht-Ausgangsmaterial durch einen Wärmebehandlungsvorgang in einen ziehfähigen Zustand versetzt, dann gezogen und anschließend zum Erhalt vorgegebener mechanischer Eigenschaften vergütet wird, wird eine Weiterbildung vorgeschlagen, bei der der gezogene Draht zum Vergüten mindestens eine zuvor bereits zur Durchführung des Wärmebehandlungvorganges eingesetzte Ofen- und/oder Abkühleinrichtung durchläuft.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 8/06; C21D 9/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 9/00 (2006.01); C21D 9/52 (2006.01); C21D 9/567 (2006.01); C21D 9/573 (2006.01); C21D 1/34 (2006.01); C21D 9/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/567 (2013.01); C21D 9/525 (2013.01); C21D 1/34 (2013.01); C21D 9/5732 (2013.01); C21D 9/64 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19940845 C1 20001221; AR 025347 A1 20021120; BR 0003802 A 20010403; CA 2316669 A1 20010227; CN 1234884 C 20060104; CN 1291658 A 20010418; EP 1078994 A2 20010228; EP 1078994 A3 20030528; JP 2001172724 A 20010626; KR 20010021442 A 20010315; MX PA00008398 A 20020424; TR 200002516 A2 20020321; TW 524854 B 20030321; US 2002026968 A1 20020307; US 6416707 B1 20020709; US 6494973 B2 20021217

INPADOC legal status

2007-02-28 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20070122

2004-02-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20031117

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 21D 8/06 A

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 21D 9/52 B

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 21D 9/54 B

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 21D 9/56 B

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 21D 9/567 B

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 21D 9/573 B

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 21D 9/26 -

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI