EP 1079002 A1 20010228 - A method for applying coatings on substrates
Title (en)
A method for applying coatings on substrates
Title (de)
Verfahren zur Herstellung von Beschichtungen auf Gegenständen
Title (fr)
Méthode d'application de revêtements sur des substrats
Publication
Application
Priority
US 37895699 A 19990823
Abstract (en)
A method for forming a metal-containing layer on a substrate is disclosed. A slurry of the metal is first deposited on the substrate; followed by heating to remove volatile material from the slurry, and to form a layer of the metal. In another embodiment, a slurry of aluminum is deposited over the slurry of the metal, before or after the metal has been heat-treated to some degree. A diffusion heat treatment results in a coating which includes the noble-metal aluminide compound. Related articles are also disclosed.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
C23C 10/20 (2006.01); C23C 10/02 (2006.01); C23C 10/08 (2006.01); C23C 10/18 (2006.01); C23C 10/26 (2006.01); C23C 24/08 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR US)
C23C 10/02 (2013.01 - EP US); C23C 10/18 (2013.01 - EP KR US); C23C 10/26 (2013.01 - EP US); C23C 24/087 (2013.01 - EP US); Y10S 428/937 (2013.01 - EP US); Y10S 428/938 (2013.01 - EP US); Y10S 428/941 (2013.01 - EP US); Y10T 29/49318 (2015.01 - EP US); Y10T 428/12063 (2015.01 - EP US); Y10T 428/1209 (2015.01 - EP US); Y10T 428/12104 (2015.01 - EP US); Y10T 428/12736 (2015.01 - EP US); Y10T 428/1275 (2015.01 - EP US); Y10T 428/12875 (2015.01 - EP US); Y10T 428/12889 (2015.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [XA] US 4009146 A 19770222 - CORK FRANK, et al
- [X] US 3741791 A 19730626 - MAXWELL D, et al
- [X] US 5807428 A 19980915 - BOSE KRISHNANGSHU [US], et al
- [X] US 4542048 A 19850917 - NICKOLA RICHARD A [US], et al
- [X] US 5366765 A 19941122 - MILANIAK MICHAEL S [US], et al
- [X] US 5824366 A 19981020 - BOSE KRISHNANGSHU [US], et al
- [X] US 5547770 A 19960820 - MEELU MEHAR C [GB], et al
- [X] US 4241113 A 19801223 - CARUGHI CARLO [IT], et al
- [XA] US 5922409 A 19990713 - MCMORDIE BRUCE G [US], et al
- [X] US 5650235 A 19970722 - MCMORDIE BRUCE G [US], et al
- [XA] US 3979273 A 19760907 - PANZERA CARLINO, et al
- [XA] US 5658614 A 19970819 - BASTA WILLIAM C [US], et al
- [A] US 5897966 A 19990427 - GROSSKLAUS JR WARREN D [US], et al
- [XP] WO 9942633 A1 19990826 - MTU MUENCHEN GMBH [DE], et al
- [XP] DE 19824792 A1 19991216 - MTU MUENCHEN GMBH [DE]
- [XA] WO 9915716 A1 19990401 - ALLISON ENGINE CO INC [US]
- [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198529, Derwent World Patents Index; Class A82, AN 1985-174586, XP002153291
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 362 (C - 389) 4 December 1986 (1986-12-04)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 302 (C - 616) 12 July 1989 (1989-07-12)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 11 30 September 1998 (1998-09-30)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
CH DE FR IT LI NL SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1079002 A1 20010228; JP 2001115250 A 20010424; KR 20010050147 A 20010615; KR 20070097017 A 20071002; US 2002094445 A1 20020718; US 6485780 B1 20021126; US 6613445 B2 20030902
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 00306795 A 20000809; JP 2000249111 A 20000821; KR 20000048486 A 20000822; KR 20070093180 A 20070913; US 37895699 A 19990823; US 4667302 A 20020116