Global patent index - EP 1079009 A2

EP 1079009 A2 2001-02-28 - Device and method to form the split selvedge in a weaving loom

Title (en)

Device and method to form the split selvedge in a weaving loom

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Bilden einer Schnittleiste in einer Webmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour former une fausse lisière sur un métier à tisser

Publication

EP 1079009 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00111570 A

Priority

IT MI991221 A

Abstract (en)

The invention concerns a device and a method to form the split selvedge in a loom, in which the device comprises independent motor means controlled by a central processing unit of the loom on the basis of the actual weaving parameters of each single weft, thereby varying the moment of mutual shifting of the selvedge yarns. It is thus possible to equalize the final tension level of the single wefts, independently from the weaving conditions and from the characteristics of the single weft being inserted, thereby obtaining, after cutting of the split selvedge, a fringe of uniform length even for fabrics woven with different wefts. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03C 11/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079009 A2 20010228; EP 1079009 A3 20010530; IT MI991221 A1 19990830

INPADOC legal status

2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031209

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030729

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010803

2001-07-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PROMATECH S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI