Global Patent Index - EP 1079010 A3

EP 1079010 A3 2001-05-30 - Stop motion for yarn processing machines for monitoring yarn groups with different single yarn consumption

Title (en)

Stop motion for yarn processing machines for monitoring yarn groups with different single yarn consumption

Title (de)

Fadenwächter für Fadenverarbeitungsmaschinen zur Überwachung von Fadengruppen mit unterschiedlichem Verbrauch der Einzelfäden

Title (fr)

Dispositif casse fil pour machines de traitement de fil destiné à contrôler des groupes de fils présentant une consommation différente pour chaque fil

Publication

EP 1079010 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00112359 A

Priority

DE 19927964 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19927964A1] The yarn (14) passes through an eyelet (13) at the end (2) of a U-shaped spring wire (1) that is guided to move in combs (16) and guide rods (8,9). The wire (1) has deformations (6, 22) that respectively touch electrical contact (18) when tension is excessive and contact (3) when there is an end break. The spring force and contact spacing can be adjusted to suit conditions and provide damping.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 51/30; B65H 63/02; B65H 63/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 59/40 (2006.01); D01H 13/16 (2006.01); D02H 13/08 (2006.01); D03D 51/20 (2006.01); D03D 51/34 (2006.01); D04B 35/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 35/14 (2013.01); B65H 59/40 (2013.01); D01H 13/1625 (2013.01); D02H 13/08 (2013.01); D03D 51/20 (2013.01); D03D 51/34 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19927964 A1 20001221; EP 1079010 A2 20010228; EP 1079010 A3 20010530

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031205

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030724

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI