Global patent index - EP 1079017 A2

EP 1079017 A2 2001-02-28 - Stocking with a seam-free slip-resistant coating in the upper opening edge

Title (en)

Stocking with a seam-free slip-resistant coating in the upper opening edge

Title (de)

Strumpf mit einer nahtfrei angebrachten rutschhemmenden Beschichtung im Randbereich der oberen Öffnung

Title (fr)

Bas avec un revêtement antidérapant sans jointures au bord périphérique de l'ouverture supérieure

Publication

EP 1079017 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116998 A

Priority

DE 19940018 A

Abstract (en)

Stocking with a slide preventing coating at the edge has a compression pressure of 3-45 mm Hg at an edge elongation of 10-350% and a bending resistance of 20 cN x mm and the opening gas a coating adhesion of at least 3 N/cm.

Abstract (de)

Strumpf mit einer nahtfrei angebrachten rutschhemmenden Beschichtung im Randbereich der oberen Öffnung des Strumpfes, wobei der Rand des Strumpfes bei einer Dehnung von 10 % bis 350 % einen Kompressionsdruck von 3 bis 45 mm Hg erzeugt sowie der Rand eine breitenbezogene Biegesteifigkeit (DIN 53121) von mindestens 20 cN x mm aufweist und im Bereich der Strumpföffnung die Haftkraft der Beschichtung auf dem Strumpf mindestens 3 N/cm beträgt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06N 3/12; A41B 11/12; C08G 18/66; D06N 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41B 11/04 (2006.01); A41B 11/12 (2006.01); A61F 13/08 (2006.01); C08G 18/66 (2006.01); D06N 3/14 (2006.01); D06N 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06N 3/14 (2013.01); A41B 11/04 (2013.01); A41B 11/128 (2013.01); A61F 13/08 (2013.01); C08G 18/6607 (2013.01); D04B 1/265 (2013.01); D06N 7/00 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24785 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24818 (2013.01); Y10T 442/2344 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079017 A2 20010228; EP 1079017 A3 20011031; AU 5343300 A 20010322; AU 776616 B2 20040916; DE 19940018 A1 20010301; US 6673421 B1 20040106

INPADOC legal status

2005-08-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041021

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020215

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7D 06N 3/12 A, 7D 06N 7/00 B, 7A 41B 11/12 B, 7C 08G 18/66 B, 7A 41B 11/04 B, 7A 61F 13/08 B, 7D 06N 3/14 B

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI