Global Patent Index - EP 1079018 A1

EP 1079018 A1 2001-02-28 - Process for brightening dyed denim woven fabric

Title (en)

Process for brightening dyed denim woven fabric

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Aufhellen von gefärbtem Denim-Gewebe

Title (fr)

Procédé de décoloration de tissu denim teint

Publication

EP 1079018 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00117363 A

Priority

DE 19940068 A

Abstract (en)

Controlled partial de-coloring of textiles (especially denim) dyed or printed with vat or sulfur dyes comprises treatment with one or more aminoalkane sulfinates at pH 4-7, optionally followed by post-treatment with H2O2. Controlled partial de-coloring of textiles (especially denim) dyed or printed with vat or sulfur dyes comprises treatment with one or more aminoalkane sulfinates of formula R<1>3-zN(CR<2>R<3>-SO2M)z (I) at pH 4-7, optionally followed by post-treatment with H2O2. z = 1, 2 or 3; R<1> = (a) H, 1-8C alkyl or HOCH2CH2- when z = 1 or 2; (b) as per (a) but also OH when z = 2; or (c) when z = 1 either both are as per (a) or one is as per (a) and the other as per (b); R<2> and R<3> = H or 1-4C alkyl with the total C atoms not more than 4; and M = equivalent of a mono- or di-valent metal.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird ein Verfahren zum Aufhellen bzw. zur teilweisen Entfärbung von mit Küpen- oder Schwefelfarbstoffen gefärbten Textilmaterialien, bei dem das Material in neutralem oder schwach sauren Medium mit Aminoalkansulfinsäuren behandelt wird, sowie Zubereitungen der Aminoalkansulfonsäuren zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06P 1/62; D06L 3/10; D06P 5/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/42 (2006.01); D06P 1/62 (2006.01); D06P 5/12 (2006.01); D06P 5/13 (2006.01); D06P 5/15 (2006.01); D06P 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06P 5/151 (2013.01); C11D 3/42 (2013.01); D06P 1/628 (2013.01); D06P 5/12 (2013.01); D06P 5/13 (2013.01); D06P 5/131 (2013.01); D06P 5/134 (2013.01); D06P 5/15 (2013.01); D06P 5/155 (2013.01); D06P 1/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079018 A1 20010228; DE 19940068 A1 20010301; US 6890359 B1 20050510

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071107

2008-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASF SE

2007-07-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR BRIGHTENING DYED DENIM WOVEN FABRIC

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031105

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI