Global Patent Index - EP 1079024 A2

EP 1079024 A2 2001-02-28 - Paving block and laying structure thereof

Title (en)

Paving block and laying structure thereof

Title (de)

Pflasterstein und daraus hergestelltes Muster

Title (fr)

Elément de pavage et dessin ainsi obtenu

Publication

EP 1079024 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99122959 A

Priority

JP 24225599 A

Abstract (en)

A paving block comprises a base (1) of quadrangular prismatic shape formed with a plurality of projections (11) and indentations of interlockable and complementary configuration formed on each side wall of the base. On two opposite side walls (30, 40) the projections (11) and the indentations (12) are arranged in a symmetrical pattern, whereas on the other two opposite side walls (10, 20) the projections (11) and the indentations (12) are arranged in an alternate pattern. The paving block may further include an elevated portion (2) mounted on a top surface of the base and having a top surface which has a smaller area than the top surface of the base. The blocks can be laid in various layout patterns to form the laying structure of attractive appearance by interlocking the interlocking projections and indentations with each other. The grooves defined between the elevated portions (2) may be filled with earth for planting or with an elastic material. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 5/00; E01C 9/00; E01C 11/22; E01C 11/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 5/00 (2006.01); E01C 9/00 (2006.01); E01C 11/22 (2006.01); E01C 11/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 11/245 (2013.01); E01C 5/00 (2013.01); E01C 9/002 (2013.01); E01C 9/004 (2013.01); E01C 11/225 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079024 A2 20010228; EP 1079024 A3 20020102; JP 2001064902 A 20010313

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020601

2002-10-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI