Global Patent Index - EP 1079027 A2

EP 1079027 A2 2001-02-28 - Piling system

Title (en)

Piling system

Title (de)

Pfahlsystem

Title (fr)

Système de pieux

Publication

EP 1079027 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00307327 A

Priority

GB 9920036 A

Abstract (en)

A piling system consisting of both methods and apparatus, which in one embodiment is for use installing building foundations and in a second embodiment is for use as a soil sampler. There is provided driving apparatus for inserting ground piles (1), wherein a rod (9) is inserted into the channel (8) of the driver (1) and the rod (9) is then driven into the ground. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 1/04; E02D 7/04; E02D 27/14; E04H 12/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 1/04 (2006.01); E02D 7/04 (2006.01); E02D 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 7/10 (2013.01); E02D 1/04 (2013.01); E02D 7/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079027 A2 20010228; EP 1079027 A3 20030102; GB 9920036 D0 19991027

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-10-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI