Global Patent Index - EP 1079031 A2

EP 1079031 A2 2001-02-28 - Adapter for suspension of a shower head

Title (en)

Adapter for suspension of a shower head

Title (de)

Adapter für Duschkopfaufhängungen

Title (fr)

Adaptateur pour la suspension d'une pomme de douche

Publication

EP 1079031 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117078 A

Priority

DE 29914810 U

Abstract (en)

The shower head (20) has an elongated handle with a head (21) at one end and a pivot (24) connected to a holder at the other end. The holder has a bore (26) which fits over a first conical peg (18) on a slider (14) on a vertical rod (10,12) attached to the wall. A holder (32) for a bracket (42) can fit over the first peg and has a second conical peg (30) for the shower head support. The bracket has recesses (54) in its top surface to accommodate clothes hooks.

Abstract (de)

Eine Adaptervorrichtung (28) für Duschkopfaufhängungen besteht aus einem Trägerkörper (29) mit einem Aufnahmeteil (30) für einen Duschkopf und Befestigungsmitteln zum lösbaren Anbringen des Trägerkörpers (29) an der Duschkopfaufhängung. Die Adaptervorrichtung (28) enthält ein zweites Aufnahmeteil (32) zur Aufnahme von Aufhängelementen (42). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 57/12 (2006.01); E03C 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 57/12 (2013.01); E03C 1/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29914810 U1 19991223; EP 1079031 A2 20010228; EP 1079031 A3 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-07-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI