Global Patent Index - EP 1079032 A2

EP 1079032 A2 2001-02-28 - In- and outlet fitting for bath tubs or showers

Title (en)

In- and outlet fitting for bath tubs or showers

Title (de)

Zu- und Ablaufgarnitur für Bade- oder Duschwannen

Title (fr)

Robinetterie combinée d'amenée et de sortie d'eau pour baignoires ou douches

Publication

EP 1079032 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810660 A

Priority

CH 157899 A

Abstract (en)

The water feed for a bath or shower has a housing (7) with a fixing ring (12) at the rear for engaging the wall of the tub. It has a connection for a water pipe extending through an opening (12c) in the ring. A water feed valve is connected to the casing. The casing has a second section (15) with an outlet opening (15d) and a rotary handle (18) to adjust the outlet valve. The first housing section with the sealing ring can clamped to the wall independently of the second section.

Abstract (de)

Die Zu- und Ablaufgarnitur weist ein erstes Gehäuseteil (7) auf, das an der Rückseite einer Seitenwandung (2) der Wanne (1) mit einem wannenseitig anzuordnenden Befestigungsring (12) an der Seitenwandung (2) zu befestigen ist. Weiter ist eine wannenseitig anzuordnende und mit dem genannten ersten Gehäuseteil (7) verbundene Zulaufarmatur vorgesehen, die ein zweites Gehäuseteil (15) mit einem Auslaufkanal (15c), eine Auslauföffnung (15d) und einen Drehgriff (18) zur Betätigung des Ablaufventils (9) umfasst. Das erste Gehäuseteil (7) ist mit dem Befestigungsring (12) unabhängig vom zweiten Gehäuseteil (15) an der Seitenwandung (2) festklemmbar anzubringen, derart, dass zur Reinigungszwecken das zweite Gehäuseteil (15) ohne Lösen des Befestigungsringes (12) abnehmbar ist. Die wannenseitigen Teile lassen sich zu Reinigungszwecken sehr einfach entfernen und anschliessend sind die Durchgänge zum Reinigen gut zugänglich. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/24; E03C 1/042

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/04 (2006.01); E03C 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/04 (2013.01); E03C 1/24 (2013.01); E03C 2201/80 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0731222 A2 19960911 - VIEGENER FRANZ II [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 20010631 U1 20000831; AT 318345 T 20060315; AT 4691 U1 20011025; CA 2316734 A1 20010227; CA 2316734 C 20070612; DE 50012257 D1 20060427; EP 1079032 A2 20010228; EP 1079032 A3 20021113; EP 1079032 B1 20060222; US 6292958 B1 20010925

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50012257

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MB, DE

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130725

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130725

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 318345 T

- Effective date: 20130725

2014-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-02-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GEBERIT INTERNATIONAL A.G.

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-09-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50012257

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2013-09-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50012257

- Representative's name: HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MB, DE

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120711

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120727

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120806

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110728

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-03-24 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20100304

2010-02-26 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GEBERIT INTERNATIONAL AG

- Free text: GEBERIT TECHNIK AG#SCHACHENSTRASSE 77#8645 JONA (CH) -TRANSFER TO- GEBERIT INTERNATIONAL AG#SCHACHENSTRASSE 77#8645 JONA (CH)

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060222

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060725

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070725

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060523

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070725

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061123

2006-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-09-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20060222

2006-07-24 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060724

2006-06-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060613

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-06-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060602

2006-05-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060522

2006-05-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060522

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012257 P 20060427

2006-03-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-03-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060222

2006-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2006-02-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-02-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2006-02-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-02-22 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060222

2006-02-22 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060222

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030417

- Countries: AL

2003-07-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030417

- Countries: LT

2003-07-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030417

- Countries: LV

2003-07-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030417

- Countries: MK

2003-07-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030417

- Countries: RO

2003-07-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030417

- Countries: SI

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030417

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI