Global Patent Index - EP 1079042 A2

EP 1079042 A2 2001-02-28 - Mounting for edge shutterings of floor slabs

Title (en)

Mounting for edge shutterings of floor slabs

Title (de)

Halterung für Bodenplatten-Randabschalungen

Title (fr)

Support de coffrage de bordure de dalle

Publication

EP 1079042 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117846 A

Priority

DE 19939845 A

Abstract (en)

The holder has a vertical support to fix cladding boards or plates (2) and an anchor part connected to the support to fix the holder to the floor. The anchor part is formed as a plate with sliding lugs (16) to hold at least one anchor pole (18) inserted in the floor. The plate is preferably formed with parallel slits (12), through which the lugs project. The plates preferably have the lugs on one side and a clamp element on the other side.

Abstract (de)

Eine Halterung, insbesondere für Bodenplatten-Randabschalungen, weist eine Platte (2) als Verankerungsteil auf, in welcher zwei Ösen (16) verschiebbar gelagert sind, durch die ein Verankerungspfahl (18) in den Boden der Baugrube geschlagen werden kann. Infolge der Verschiebbarkeit der Ösen (16) kann die Platte (2) in einem weiten Bereich so ausgerichtet werden, daß ein an einen senkrechten abgewinkelten Randteil (4) der Platte (2) angenageltes Vierkantholz (6) auf die gewünschte Schalbrettposition ausgerichtet werden kann. In dieser Position wird die Platte (2) durch Fixieren der Ösen (16) festgelegt. Hierzu ragen die Ösen (16) mit einem Klemmteil durch in der Platte vorgesehene Schlitze (12), wobei die Klemmteile als Keil (20) oder Schraubbefestigung ausgebildet sein können. Ein an der Platte (2) angebrachtes vertikales Führungsrohr dient dem Einstecken eines Geländerhalters für den Fall, daß die Halterung für eine Deckenrandabschalung benutzt wird, wozu zwei von der Unterkante der Platte (2) seitlich wegragende Laschen (38) mit Nagellöchern (40) dienen, mit denen die Platte (2) an über die Mauer hinausragende Teile der Deckenschalung angenagelt werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 13/00; E04G 11/36; E04G 17/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 11/36 (2006.01); E04G 13/00 (2006.01); E04G 17/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 11/365 (2013.01); E04G 13/00 (2013.01); E04G 17/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079042 A2 20010228; EP 1079042 A3 20030514; EP 1079042 B1 20070919; DE 19939845 A1 20010301; DE 50014663 D1 20071031

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: GACHNANG AG PATENTANWAELTE, CH

2008-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080620

2007-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50014663

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-10-31

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2007-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: HANS RUDOLF GACHNANG PATENTANWALT

2007-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI

2004-02-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI

2003-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 04G 13/00 A

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 04G 17/14 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 04G 11/36 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 04G 17/00 B

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI