Global Patent Index - EP 1079043 A2

EP 1079043 A2 2001-02-28 - Connection element for shuttering boards

Title (en)

Connection element for shuttering boards

Title (de)

Verbindungselement für Schalungsplatten

Title (fr)

Elément de connexion pour plaques de coffrage

Publication

EP 1079043 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117847 A

Priority

DE 19939844 A

Abstract (en)

The connection element has two support plates (36) to support two abutting cladding plates (30) on both sides. One of the support parts is shaped as an angle bar (36) and forms an isolated cladding element. A clamping device (24,28) clamps the support plates on both sides of the abutment point. The other support plate is formed as an angled plate. The angle plate has an opening in its apex to hold the clamp elements.

Abstract (de)

Ein Verbindungselement umfaßt zwei Anlageplatten (2,36) , die an einer Stoßstelle zwischen zwei Schalungsplatten (30) beiderseitig an diese angelegt und gegeneinander verspannt werden, wobei die Schalungsplatten (30) genau miteinander ausgerichtet fixiert werden. Eine Anlageplatte (2,36) kann dachförmig abgewinkelt sein und läßt sich dann bei Eckverbindungen sowohl am Innenwinkel als auch am Außenwinkel ansetzen und auch bei ebenen Verbindungen zwischen zwei Platten (30) mit den beiderseitigen Traufenkanten gegen die Platten verspannen. Zum Spannen dient ein den First der Anlageplatte durchsetzender Spannstab (24,25) und eine Gegenplatte (36), an welcher der Spannstab verankert wird. Eine bevorzugte Ausführungsform benutzt winkelförmige Anlageplatten (2,26): eine dabei außen über die eine Winkelplatte (4) verlaufende gleichermaßen abgewinkelte Winkelstrebe (2) dient der Versteifung und bildet außerdem mit der Winkelplatte (4) und aus dieser herausgebogenen Laschen (6) einen Führungskanal (16) zum Einstecken von Geländerhaltern (18). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 17/00; E04G 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 17/00 (2006.01); E04G 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 17/001 (2013.01); E04G 17/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079043 A2 20010228; EP 1079043 A3 20030205; DE 19939844 A1 20010301

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-11-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-10-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI