Global Patent Index - EP 1079047 A3

EP 1079047 A3 2001-05-30 - Adapter element for doors

Title (en)

Adapter element for doors

Title (de)

Adapterelement für Türen

Title (fr)

Elément d'adaptation pour portes

Publication

EP 1079047 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00113252 A

Priority

DE 19939892 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1079047A2] The adapter element has one side for coupling to a door fitting (12, 13) and another side with a bearing surface (14) for the rotary knob (16, 18) of a door lock system. An insertion section (22, 24) for a standard lock cylinder can be inserted into an opening in the door fitting and is shaped so that its end view corresp. to that of a standard lock cylinder and/or the plug-in section can fit accurately into the opening. An Independent claim is also included for an application of an adapter element to an esp. electromechanical lock system for doors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 3/00; E05B 47/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 3/06 (2006.01); E05B 15/02 (2006.01); E05B 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/0649 (2013.01); E05B 3/06 (2013.01); E05B 47/0615 (2013.01); E05B 15/02 (2013.01); E05B 63/0034 (2013.01); E05B 63/0065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079047 A2 20010228; EP 1079047 A3 20010530; DE 19939892 A1 20010301

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060103

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020321

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010814

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI