Global Patent Index - EP 1079055 A2

EP 1079055 A2 2001-02-28 - Vehicle door lock system with passive entry function

Title (en)

Vehicle door lock system with passive entry function

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeug-Türschliesssystem mit Passive Entry-Funktion

Title (fr)

Sytème de verroullage de porte de voitures avec function d'accès passive

Publication

EP 1079055 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115801 A

Priority

DE 19938816 A

Abstract (en)

The system has a lock that is locked and unlocked by a motor or switch, control electronics (3) with a passive entry function, a remote control module (5), a door outer handle (6) and a lock cylinder (7) for operation by a mechanical key (8). The control electronics require a reaction phase including start-up, authorization check and action intervals, especially for unlocking the lock. The lock cylinder has a second associated function, i.e. the function of starting the reaction phase by contact without the mechanical key. An Independent claim is also included for a lock cylinder arrangement for a motor vehicle door lock system

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein Kraftfahrzeug-Türschließsystem mit einem motorisch entriegelbaren und verriegelbaren, ggf. auch motorisch öffenbaren Kraftfahrzeugschloß, mit einer Steuerelektronik mit Passive Entry-Funktion, einem Femsteuermodul bei einer Bedienungsperson, einem Türaußengriff o. dgl. und einem Schließzylinder (7) für eine Betätigung mit einem mechanischen Schlüssel, wobei die Steuerelektronik zeitlich eine Reaktionsphase mit Anlaufintervall, Berechtigungs-Prüfintervall und Aktionsintervall, insbesondere zur Entriegelung des Kraftfahrzeugschlosses, benötigt. Eine besonders zweckmäßige Art, die für die Reaktionsphase erforderlich Zeit zu kaschieren, ergibt sich erfindungsgemäß dadurch, daß dem Schließzylinder (7) eine zweite Funktion zugeordnet ist, nämlich die ohne den mechanischen Schlüssel durch Berührung auszuübende Funktion des Startens der Reaktionsphase der Steuerelektronik. Von besonderer Bedeutung ist dabei eine Ausführung, die dadurch gekennzeichnet ist, daß die zweite Funktion des Schließzylinders (7) durch mechanisches Drücken auf den Schließzylinder (7) auslösbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 83/36 (2014.01); E05B 85/00 (2014.01); E05B 17/22 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 83/36 (2013.01); E05B 85/01 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00373 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079055 A2 20010228; EP 1079055 A3 20010613; EP 1079055 B1 20060201; DE 19938816 A1 20010301; DE 50012152 D1 20060413

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060722

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2007-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20061103

2006-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-07-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060722

2006-05-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060512

2006-05-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060501

2006-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50012152

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-04-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-02-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2006-02-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-02-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060201

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BROSE SCHLIESSSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-03-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-02-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011213

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI