Global Patent Index - EP 1079056 A2

EP 1079056 A2 2001-02-28 - Snap hinge

Title (en)

Snap hinge

Title (de)

Klappscharnier-Gelenk

Title (fr)

Charnière à encliquetage

Publication

EP 1079056 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117762 A

Priority

DE 29914746 U

Abstract (en)

The hinge comprises a hinge arm (1) joined to a fixed part (2) by a hinge pin (3). A guide component can be moved along guide slots (5, 6) in the arm and fixed part, the slot (6) for the fixed part being non-linear. At least one spring is used to hold the guide component in either of its two stop end positions (E1, E2). Pivoting the arm to move the guide component from one stop end position to a turning point (W) in the non-linear slot is achieved by overcoming a spring bias, and after this turning point the spring bias urges the arm into the second stop end position.

Abstract (de)

Klappscharnier-Gelenk mit zwei Anschlags-Endpositionen (E1 und E2) für ein Führungsglied in einer nicht geraden, einen Wendepunkt aufweisenden Führungsbahn (5). Das Führungsglied (4) wird durch mindestens eine Feder (7) in einer der beiden Anschlags-Endpositionen (E1 und E2) gehalten. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 1/12; E05D 11/10; E05F 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/10 (2006.01); E05D 5/06 (2006.01); E05F 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/105 (2013.01); E05D 11/06 (2013.01); E05D 5/06 (2013.01); E05D 2005/067 (2013.01); E05F 1/14 (2013.01); Y10T 16/54029 (2013.01); Y10T 16/544 (2013.01); Y10T 16/5448 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29914746 U1 19991125; CA 2316573 A1 20010224; DE 50015376 D1 20081113; EP 1079056 A2 20010228; EP 1079056 A3 20060315; EP 1079056 B1 20081001; US 6401299 B1 20020611

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160809

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2015-05-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150430

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130828

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50015376

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: SCHUMACHER & WILLSAU PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110818

2012-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110818

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100825

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-09-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090702

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50015376

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-11-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-10-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070219

2007-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SFS INTEC HOLDING AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20060714

2006-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI