Global Patent Index - EP 1079060 A2

EP 1079060 A2 2001-02-28 - Cabinet with a shutter

Title (en)

Cabinet with a shutter

Title (de)

Schrankmöbel mit einer Jalousie

Title (fr)

Armoire avec volet roulant

Publication

EP 1079060 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111226 A

Priority

DE 29914828 U

Abstract (en)

The shutter (2) is joined to an endless belt (4) guided over an upper and lower return pulley (5,8) positioned at the back of the cabinet (1). One half (6) of the belt (4) is equipped with weights, preferably in the shape of chain links (7). When the roll-front (2) is completely closed the half of the belt which is equipped with weights (6) is positioned on one side of the return pulleys (5,8) the other half of the belt (4) is positioned opposite. The weights (7) are moved up or down according to the lifting or lowering of the front (2). The roll-front (2) can be opened from the top or from the bottom and is kept in position at any required height.

Abstract (de)

Ein Schrankmöbel mit einer Jalousie, welche in seitlichen Führungsschienen oder Führungsnuten geführt und an der Rückseite des Schrankmöbels mit einer Vorrichtung (3) zum Gewichtsausgleich gekoppelt ist, ist erfindungsgemäß dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Vorrichtung (3) aus einem um eine untere und eine obere Umlenkeinrichutng (5) umlaufenden Endlosband (4) besteht, an dessen einem Trum (6) das rückseitige Ende der Jalousie (2) angeschlossen ist, wobei etwa eine Hälfte des Endlosbandes (4) über ihre gesamte Länge hinweg ein höheres Gewicht aufweist als die jeweils andere Hälfte des Endlosbandes (4). Dadurch kann bei nach unten zu öffnender Jalousie (2) die schwerere Hälfte des Bandes entgegen der Abwärtsbewegung der Jalousie (2) beim Öffnungsvorgang nach oben bewegt werden. Dadurch wird ein ungebremstes Herunterfallen der Jalousie (2) verhindert. Es ist auch möglich, bei nach oben zu öffnender Jalousie (2) das Anheben zu erleichtern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/11; E06B 9/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/115 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29914828 U1 19991028; EP 1079060 A2 20010228; EP 1079060 A3 20030115

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-11-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-10-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI