Global Patent Index - EP 1079062 A2

EP 1079062 A2 2001-02-28 - Step Ladder

Title (en)

Step Ladder

Title (de)

Stehleiter

Title (fr)

Escabeau

Publication

EP 1079062 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00307287 A

Priority

GB 9919991 A

Abstract (en)

A step ladder, including a rung assembly (22) and first and second legs (14, 16) characterised by a single support member (26) depending from the rung assembly (22) such that, in use, an end of the support member (26) and one end of each of the first and second legs (14, 16) define the contact points upon which the ladder rests. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06C 1/38; E06C 7/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06C 1/38 (2006.01); E06C 1/39 (2006.01); E06C 7/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06C 1/382 (2013.01); E06C 1/39 (2013.01); E06C 7/44 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079062 A2 20010228; EP 1079062 A3 20010613; GB 9919991 D0 19991027

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040205

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030924

2002-03-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011213

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI