Global patent index - EP 1079070 A2

EP 1079070 A2 2001-02-28 - Heatshield for a turbine rotor

Title (en)

Heatshield for a turbine rotor

Title (de)

Wärmestaueinheit für eine Rotoranordnung

Title (fr)

Bouclier thermique pour un rotor de turbine

Publication

EP 1079070 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810682 A

Priority

DE 19940525 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a heat accumulation unit (8), which is arranged between two rotor discs (1,2) and has two connection edges (15,16) to connect it to the edges of the rotor discs. The heat accumulation unit covers an intermediate space (9) between the rotor discs. The connection edges of the heat accumulation unit each have a toothed contour with webbed connection elements (17) and intermediate spaces (21). The peripheral edges (3) of the rotor discs have a corresponding toothed counter contour (13,14), so that the connection elements can be releaseably and positively connected to the toothed counter contour.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine Vorrichtung zur Abtrennung eines mit einem heißen Arbeitsmedium durchströmten Raumbereiches von einem Raumbereich innerhalb einer Rotoranordnung einer Strömungsmaschine, vorzugsweise einer Gasturbine, mit wenigstens zwei axial hintereinander angeordneten Rotorscheiben, die über wenigstens einen Verbindungsbereich fest miteinander verbindbar sind und wenigstens im Bereich ihrer radialen Umfangsränder voneinander beabstandet sind, und mit einer flächig ausgebildeten Wärmestaueinheit, die zwischen zwei benachbarten Rotorscheiben angeordnet ist und zwei Verbindungskanten aufweist, entlang derer die Wärmestaueinheit jeweils im Bereich der Umfangsränder der benachbarten Rotorscheiben in Wirkverbindung bringbar ist, und die einen rotorseitig sich zwischen beiden Rotorscheiben erstreckenden Zwischenraum abdeckt. Die Erfindung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß die Verbindungskanten der Wärmestaueinheit jeweils eine gezahnte Kontur mit stegartig ausgebildeten Verbindungselementen mit dazwischenbefindlichen Zwischenräumen aufweisen, daß jeweils im Bereich des Umfangsrandes der Rotorscheiben eine, zu der gezahnten Kontur der Verbindungskanten der Wärmestaueinheit in etwa korrespondierende gezahnte Gegenkontur vorgesehen ist, und daß die Verbindungselemente mit der gezahnten Gegenkontur in eine formschlüssige, lösbar feste Verbindung bringbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/06; F01D 5/06; F01D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/06 (2006.01); F01D 5/08 (2006.01); F01D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/001 (2013.01); F01D 5/066 (2013.01); F01D 5/08 (2013.01); F05D 2240/40 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079070 A2 20010228; EP 1079070 A3 20040114; EP 1079070 B1 20050316; DE 19940525 A1 20010301

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050725

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070731

2006-07-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060720

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-07-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060714

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051219

2005-06-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050606

2005-04-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50009768

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-04-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-04-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2005-03-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2005-03-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2004-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040705

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 01D 5/06 B

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 01D 11/00 B

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 01D 5/06 A

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI