Global Patent Index - EP 1079079 A2

EP 1079079 A2 2001-02-28 - Engine control system for a diesel engine

Title (en)

Engine control system for a diesel engine

Title (de)

Motorsteuerung für einen Dieselmotor

Title (fr)

Commande de moteur pour un moteur diesel

Publication

EP 1079079 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113356 A

Priority

DE 19939988 A

Abstract (en)

The control (23) permits operation of the diesel motor (10) in a desalination mode in which a higher temperature is produced in the storage catalyst (29) as an alternating reducing active exhaust gas and an oxidizing active exhaust gas are produced. The second salts are desorbed from the storage catalyst (29). The control has a storage catalyst (29) arranged in the exhaust gas pipe. The control permits operation of the diesel motor (10) in a storage mode in which a first salt from the exhaust gas of the diesel motor (10) having relatively lower chemical bonding energy e.g. NOx and second salt with relatively higher chemical bonding energy e.g. SOx are absorbed in the storage catalyst (29). The control (23) operates in a regeneration mode in which a reduced exhaust gas is produced so that at least the first salt from the storage catalyst (29) is desorbed.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Steuerung für einen Dieselmotor, in dessen Abgasstrang ein Speicherkatalysator angeordnet ist, wobei die Steuerung einen Betrieb des Dieselmotors in einem Speichermodus ermöglicht, in dem aus dem Abgas des Dieselmotors NOx-Salze und SOx-Salze im Speicherkatalysator adsorbiert werden. Um den Speicherkatalysator hinsichtlich der NOx-Salze zu regenerieren, ermöglicht die Steuerung einen Betrieb des Dieselmotors in einem Regenerationsmodus, in dem ein reduzierend wirkendes Abgas erzeugt wird, wodurch zumindest die NOx-Salze aus dem Speicherkatalysator desorbiert werden. Um den Speicherkatalysator auch hinsichtlich der SOx-Salze zu regenerieren, ermöglicht die erfindungsgemäße Steuerung auch einen Betrieb des Dieselmotors in einem Entsalzungsmodus, in dem im Speicherkatalysator eine höhere Temperatur erzeugt wird als im Speichermodus und Regenerationsmodus und in dem abwechselnd ein reduzierend wirkendes Abgas und ein oxidierend wirkendes Abgas erzeugt wird, wodurch zumindest die SOx-Salze aus dem Speicherkatalysator desorbiert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/20; F02D 41/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/08 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/0842 (2013.01); F01N 3/0871 (2013.01); F01N 3/0885 (2013.01); F02D 41/0275 (2013.01); F02D 41/028 (2013.01); F01N 2240/16 (2013.01); F01N 2570/04 (2013.01); F02D 2250/32 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19750226 C1 19981029 - DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079079 A2 20010228; EP 1079079 A3 20030212; EP 1079079 B1 20040303; DE 19939988 A1 20010315; ES 2215524 T3 20041016

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170629

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170630

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130624

2014-10-14 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20141014

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130623

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120717

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120621

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-09-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-09-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-12-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2215524 T3

2004-04-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040322

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005490 P 20040408

2004-04-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-09-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ENGINE CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A DIESEL ENGINE

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030124

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-02-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 01N 3/08 A

2003-02-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02D 41/02 B

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI