Global patent index - EP 1079096 A2

EP 1079096 A2 2001-02-28 - Fuel injector arrangement

Title (en)

Fuel injector arrangement

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzanordnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'injection de combustible

Publication

EP 1079096 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00307119 A

Priority

GB 9919785 A

Abstract (en)

A fuel injector arrangement comprising a nozzle body provided with a first bore (11) within which a valve needle (12) is slidable, the needle being engageable with a first seating (11a) to control the flow of fuel from a delivery chamber (13) to an outlet opening. A control valve arrangement (26) is provided for controlling the supply of fuel to the delivery chamber (13). The control valve arrangement (26) includes a valve member (28) which is engageable with a second seating (46), the second seating (46) being moveable with the valve needle (12) to control the supply of fuel to the delivery chamber (13). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02; F02M 63/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0005 (2013.01); F02M 63/0007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079096 A2 20010228; EP 1079096 A3 20030409; EP 1079096 B1 20040512; DE 60010597 D1 20040617; DE 60010597 T2 20050525; GB 9919785 D0 19991027

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110821

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110821

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100825

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100831

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-26 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2005-06-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050215

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60010597

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-05-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-05-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-05-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT

2003-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20031003

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI