Global patent index - EP 1079110 A2

EP 1079110 A2 2001-02-28 - Coating process for a swash plate of a compressor

Title (en)

Coating process for a swash plate of a compressor

Title (de)

Beschichtungsverfahren für eine Schrägscheibe eines Kompressors

Title (fr)

Prcédé de revêtement d'un plateau-came d'un compresseur

Publication

EP 1079110 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00118022 A

Priority

  • JP 23602299 A
  • JP 2000054273 A

Abstract (en)

A method for forming a metallic coating with a component of a compressor is proposed. A supplier body (40) supplies the coating (31A; 31B) to the component (10; 20A; 20B) such as a swash plate (10). The supplier (40) is made of a material softer than that of the swash plate (10). The supplier is urged against a portion of predetermined areas (30A; 30B) of the swash plate (10). The supplier (40) is brought to a relative movement with respect to the swash plate (10) along an extending direction of the predetermined area (30A; 30B), thereby the material is gradually separated from supplier (40) and supplied to the predetermined area (30A; 30B). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 27/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/00 (2006.01); F04B 27/10 (2006.01); F04B 53/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/1054 (2013.01); F05C 2253/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079110 A2 20010228; EP 1079110 A8 20010502; BR 0003739 A 20010403; CN 1285469 A 20010228; JP 2001132639 A 20010518; KR 20010021103 A 20010315

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030301

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-02-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 04B 27/08 A, 7F 04B 27/10 B, 7B 23K 20/12 B

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000822

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI