Global Patent Index - EP 1079110 A8

EP 1079110 A8 2001-05-02 - Coating process for a swash plate of a compressor

Title (en)

Coating process for a swash plate of a compressor

Title (de)

Beschichtungsverfahren für eine Schrägscheibe eines Kompressors

Title (fr)

Prcédé de revêtement d'un plateau-came d'un compresseur

Publication

EP 1079110 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 00118022 A

Priority

  • JP 23602299 A
  • JP 2000054273 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1079110A2] A method for forming a metallic coating with a component of a compressor is proposed. A supplier body (40) supplies the coating (31A; 31B) to the component (10; 20A; 20B) such as a swash plate (10). The supplier (40) is made of a material softer than that of the swash plate (10). The supplier is urged against a portion of predetermined areas (30A; 30B) of the swash plate (10). The supplier (40) is brought to a relative movement with respect to the swash plate (10) along an extending direction of the predetermined area (30A; 30B), thereby the material is gradually separated from supplier (40) and supplied to the predetermined area (30A; 30B). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 27/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/00 (2006.01); F04B 27/10 (2006.01); F04B 53/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/1054 (2013.01); F05C 2253/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079110 A2 20010228; EP 1079110 A3 20020206; EP 1079110 A8 20010502; BR 0003739 A 20010403; CN 1285469 A 20010228; JP 2001132639 A 20010518; KR 20010021103 A 20010315

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030301

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-02-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 04B 27/08 A, 7F 04B 27/10 B, 7B 23K 20/12 B

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000822

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI