Global Patent Index - EP 1079113 A1

EP 1079113 A1 2001-02-28 - Centrifugal pump casing for a circulating pump for two fluid circuits

Title (en)

Centrifugal pump casing for a circulating pump for two fluid circuits

Title (de)

Kreiselpumpengehäuse für eine an zwei Umwälzkreise anschliessbare Pumpe

Title (fr)

Carter de pompe centrifuge pour pompe de circulation pour deux circuits

Publication

EP 1079113 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116450 A

Priority

EP 99116450 A

Abstract (en)

The casing (1) has a supply chamber with an inlet channel (7) and two outlet channels (10,11) for the two circuits. The supply chamber is separated into two impeller chambers (2,3) communicating with the inlet channel, each with a motor-driven pump impeller. One outlet channel is provided for each impeller chamber for each circuit.

Abstract (de)

Ein Kreiselpumpengehäuse für eine an zwei Umwälzkreise anschließbare Pumpe umfaßt einen Förderraum, einen zu diesem Raum führenden Einlaßkanal (7) und zwei von diesem Raum abgehende Auslaßkanäle (10, 11) für die beiden Umwälzkreise. Der Förderrraum ist in zwei gemeinsam mit dem Einlaßkanal (7) kommunizierende Laufradkammem (2, 3) für je ein durch einen eigenen Motor anreibbares Pumpenlaufrad aufgeteilt. Für jede Laufradkammer ist ein Auslaßkanal (10 bzw. 11) für je einen der beiden Umwälzkreise vorgesehen (Fig. 1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 13/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079113 A1 20010228; EP 1079113 B1 20041013; DE 59910845 D1 20041118

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160706

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160617

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160617

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-09-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910845

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-10-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030811

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010619

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI