Global Patent Index - EP 1079176 A1

EP 1079176 A1 2001-02-28 - Luminaire

Title (en)

Luminaire

Title (de)

Leuchte

Title (fr)

Luminaire

Publication

EP 1079176 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99500153 A

Priority

EP 99500153 A

Abstract (en)

A reflector assembly (34,36,38;200) for reflecting light from a bulb (12;212) in a luminaire (10;210) is designed to be mounted within the body (14;214) of the luminaire between the bulb and the top of the luminaire. The reflector assembly includes a reflector support unit (40,41;224) which is configured for mounting within the luminaire body (14;214) such that it can be adjusted upwardly and downwardly within the luminaire body. The reflector assembly (34,36,38;200) also includes at least one reflector (34,36,38;232-242) mounted to the support unit. The reflector may be removably and pivotably mounted and may be adjusted to reflect light in a desired manner. The reflector assembly (34,36,38;200) may also include an adjustment mechanism (42,74;244-254,256-262) which allows the coordinated adjustment of several reflectors. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 17/02; F21V 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/02 (2013.01); F21V 7/005 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079176 A1 20010228

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051025

2005-07-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050613

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011109

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI