Global Patent Index - EP 1079179 A1

EP 1079179 A1 2001-02-28 - Process for adapting the operating condition of a gas-turbine staged combustion chamber

Title (en)

Process for adapting the operating condition of a gas-turbine staged combustion chamber

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Adaption des Betriebszustandes einer gestuften Brennkammer für Gasturbinen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour l'adaptation de l'état de fonctionnement d'une chambre de combustion étagée de turbines à gaz

Publication

EP 1079179 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00117741 A

Priority

  • DE 10032471 A
  • DE 19939812 A

Abstract (en)

An overall fuel mass flow rate (WF) metered through a control valve (6) and adapted to a defined operating point for a power mechanism is fed into a combustion chamber. A stepped valve (7) adjusts what proportion of the overall fuel mass flow rate is fed to pilot and main burners. An electronic power mechanism regulator (8) has first (8a) and second (8b) regulating blocks. The first block adjusts the control valve. The second block controls the stepped valve.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Brennstoffeinspritzsystem für eine gestufte Brennkammer (1) eines Fluggasturbinen-Triebwerks, deren Pilotbrenner (3) stets mit einer gewissen Brennstoffmenge versorgt wird/werden, während deren Hauptbrenner(n) (4) nur bei höherer Triebwerksleistung Brennstoff zugemessen wird, wobei stromab einer die gesamte Brennstoffmenge bestimmenden Steuer-Ventileinheit (6) eine diesen Gesamt-Brennstoffmassenstrom (WF) auf die Pilotbrenner (3) sowie auf die Hauptbrenner (4) veränderbar aufteilende Stufungs-Ventileinheit (7) vorgesehen ist, die beide von einem Triebwerksregler (8) angesteuert werden, der für die Ansteuerung der Stufungs-Ventileinheit (7) die gewünschte Triebwerksleistung zugrunde legt, dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass die Triebwerksleistung durch die Belastung der Gasturbinen-Brennkammer (1) in Form eines so genannten Stufungsparameters (SP) charakterisiert ist, anhand dessen die Stufungs-Ventileinheit (7) entsprechend einer Schaltgeraden angesteuert wird, dass der Stufungsparameter (SP) aus einem funktionalen Zusammenhang abgeleitet wird, dass eine nachgeschaltete Summationsstelle zur Berechnung der Differenz zwischen einem aktuellen Wert des Stufungspunktes und einem Wert des nominalen Stufungspunktes vorgesehen ist, und dass der Summationsstelle ein Zeitelement (TIMER) nachgeordnet ist, welches so ausgebildet ist, dass nach dem Über- beziehungsweise Unterschreiten des angepassten Stufungspunktes der Umschaltvorgang zeitlich verzögert wird, wenn die Zeitdauer seit dem Ausführen der letzten Stufung kleiner ist als eine vordefinierte Zeitkonstante, die in einem Kennfeld abgelegt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/346 (2013.01); F23N 2037/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9517632 A1 19950629 - UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079179 A1 20010228; EP 1079179 B1 20041124; US 7003939 B1 20060228

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-05-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND LTD & CO KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 50008726

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130402

2013-05-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50008726

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOEFER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130402

2013-05-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50008726

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOEFER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20130402

2013-04-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50008726

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOEFER & PARTNER, DE

2005-11-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-01-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20041216

2004-12-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50008726

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-12-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-11-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010806

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND LTD & CO KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RACKWITZ, LEIF, DIPL-ING.

2001-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHMIDT, KLAUS-JUERGEN, DR. ING.

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI