Global Patent Index - EP 1079188 A1

EP 1079188 A1 2001-02-28 - Apparatus for treatment by vibration

Title (en)

Apparatus for treatment by vibration

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Behandlung mittels Vibration

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour traitement par vibration

Publication

EP 1079188 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99116707 A

Priority

EP 99116707 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus (2,202) for treatment by vibration comprising a container (8,208) extending substantially horizontally and having a to-be-treated material charge port (22,222) and a to-be-treated material discharge port (24,224); a resilient support means (84) for resiliently supporting the container (8,208); and a vibration means (88a,88b,288a,288b,288c,288d) for vibrating the container (8,208). At least part (10,12,210,212,211,213) of the container (8,208) is of a truncated conical cylindrical shape and, preferably, of a truncated circular conical cylindrical shape extending substantially horizontally. The to-be-treated material discharge port (24,224) is disposed at the lowermost end in the portion of a maximum diameter, that is a portion of the container (8,208) of the truncated conical cylindrical shape. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 7/00; F26B 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 5/04 (2006.01); F26B 7/00 (2006.01); F26B 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 11/02 (2013.01); F26B 5/04 (2013.01); F26B 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079188 A1 20010228; EP 1079188 B1 20030730; DE 69910009 D1 20030904; DE 69910009 T2 20040527

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080828

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-08-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070828

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040504

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69910009

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL

2003-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR NL

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010705

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI