Global Patent Index - EP 1079284 A1

EP 1079284 A1 2001-02-28 - Clockwork movement

Title (en)

Clockwork movement

Title (de)

Uhrwerk

Title (fr)

Mouvement pour pièce d'horlogerie

Publication

EP 1079284 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99116541 A

Priority

EP 99116541 A

Abstract (en)

A timepiece movement comprises two modules (2,3). The upper module (2) uses a plastic body (4) and the lower module (3) is located in a metallic dish (5). The metallic dish has seatings for four pillars (6,7,8,9) which fit into dished holes (44,45,46,47) in the upper plastic body. Heat is applied to the top and bottom of the pillars to rivet them to the plastic body and to the metallic dish

Abstract (fr)

Le mouvement pour pièce d'horlogerie comporte un premier module (2) fait d'un bâti (4) en matière plastique et supportant une première partie des éléments constituant le mouvement, et un second module (3) fait d'une coupelle métallique (5) et supportant une seconde partie desdits éléments constitutifs. Le premier module (2) est fixé sur le second (3) au moyen de piliers (6, 7, 8, 9) fixant le bâti (4) sur la coupelle (5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 29/02; G04B 37/08; G04C 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 29/02 (2006.01); G04B 37/05 (2006.01); G04C 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 37/05 (2013.01); G04B 29/027 (2013.01); G04C 3/008 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079284 A1 20010228

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050118

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040907

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ETA SA MANUFACTURE HORLOGERE SUISSE

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010828

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI