Global Patent Index - EP 1079292 A1

EP 1079292 A1 2001-02-28 - Gas pressure regulator

Title (en)

Gas pressure regulator

Title (de)

Gasdruckregelanlage

Title (fr)

Régulateur de pression de gaz

Publication

EP 1079292 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00116540 A

Priority

DE 19936374 A

Abstract (en)

The system includes a first connection (3) to the gas bottle (1), a second connection (11) to a second bottle (12) and a third connection (6) to the consumer. The first connection is joined to the pressure regulator (5) by a three-way coupling (4) plus a valve (9) permitting one way flow only and a medium pressure regulator (10) is positioned between the free coupling end and the second connection (11). This regulator (10) only permits flow to the element (4) and this only at reduced flow pressure over the valve (9). The operating regulator (5), three-way element (4) and valve (9) should form a single assembly group and and indicator (7) displays pressure between first connection (3), valve (9) and regulator (5), using a pressure-responsive signaller (8) to warn of impermissible pressure fall.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Gasdruckregelanlage sind zwei Gasversorgungsflaschen (1, 12) über ein T-Stück (4) miteinander verbunden, an dem über einen Betriebsdruckregler (5) ein Verbraucher anschließbar ist. Eine der Gasversorgungsflaschen dient als Reserveflasche (12), wobei zwischen ihrem Flaschenventil (13) und dem T-Stück (4) ein Mitteldruckregler (10) und ein Rückschlagventil (9) angeordnet sind. Zunächst wird nur Gas aus der Flasche (1) entnommen, das auch das Rückschlagventil (9) geschlossen hält. Erst wenn der Druck in der Flasche (1) unter den Wert des von dem Mitteldruckregler (10) eingestellten Drucks abfällt, öffnet das Rückschlagventil (9) und Gas von der Reserveflasche (12) strömt zu dem Betriebsdruckregler (5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05D 7/00; F15B 13/043; F23D 11/16; G01F 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17C 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17C 13/045 (2013.01); F17C 13/04 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0326 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0335 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19936374 A1 20010222; DE 19936374 C2 20010613; EP 1079292 A1 20010228; EP 1079292 B1 20020522

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090201

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-04-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090201

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080731

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070718

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070721

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070724

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070719

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070625

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-08-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070820

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000177 20020627

2002-06-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020523

2002-05-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL SE

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010301

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI