Global Patent Index - EP 1079333 A1

EP 1079333 A1 2001-02-28 - Inspection and investigation system for an object, such as a component of a rail way

Title (en)

Inspection and investigation system for an object, such as a component of a rail way

Title (de)

Inspektions- und Untersuchungssystem für einen Gegenstand, wie eine Komponente eines Gleises

Title (fr)

Système d'inspection et d'investigation pour un objet, tel qu'un composant d'une voie ferrée

Publication

EP 1079333 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00202954 A

Priority

  • NL 1012928 A
  • NL 1015968 A

Abstract (en)

Object checking system comprising a memory unit containing data about the object to be checked, a data processing unit, a display unit and a data input unit, wherein said units mutually communicate through machine readable signals, such as electronic pulses, wherein the system is configured such that it shows with the display unit a complete image of the object, subdivided into fields, and subsequently, in reaction to input through the data input unit, shows with the display unit the components to be checked and belonging to a field in a predetermined manner stored in the memory and, dependent from the input through the data input unit, subsequently shows with the display unit a damage image list of a selected component, while preferably digitally operating. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 3/00; B61K 9/00; B61L 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61K 9/00 (2006.01); B61L 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61L 23/042 (2013.01); B61K 9/00 (2013.01); B61L 2205/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1079333 A1 20010228; NL 1015968 C2 20010228

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150616

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061011

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010827

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI