Global Patent Index - EP 1079358 A2

EP 1079358 A2 2001-02-28 - Device to produce an illuminated message in the dark

Title (en)

Device to produce an illuminated message in the dark

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Erzeugen eines Leuchtschrifteffektes im Dunkeln

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour produire une inscription lumineuse dans l'obscurité

Publication

EP 1079358 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117920 A

Priority

DE 29914455 U

Abstract (en)

To achieve an illuminated writing effect, in the dark, a carrier surface (1) of a textile fabric or netting of glass fibers which can allow air to flow through, has a stiffener (3) along its upper edge to spread it out and for suspension (8) such as from a balloon (4). Graphic sections (2), as letters, are of a phosphorescent material, attached to the carrier (1). The letters (2) are shaped from film, containing zinc sulfide.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung eines Leuchtschrifteffektes oder eines leuchtenden Bildes im Dunkeln. Statt wie bisher derartige Leuchtschrifteffekte oder Bilder herzustellen, indem eine Anzahl von kleineren Feuerwerksartikeln in eine schwer entflammbar ausgerüstete Holzplatte in eigens dafür hergestellte Bohrungen eingesteckt und dort zu gegebener Zeit entzündet werden, wird jetzt vorgeschlagen, auf einer von Luft durchströmbaren oder aus textilem Material hergestellten Trägerfläche mit einem zur Aufhängung der Trägerfläche dienenden und dessen Oberkante stabilisierenden Versteifungselement grafische Elemente, insbesondere Buchstaben, aus einem nachleuchtenden (phosporiszierenden) Material anzubringen. Diese grafischen Elemente können nach einer Bestrahlung mit Licht einfach durch Anhängen des Versteifungselementes der Trägerfläche an einen Kran oder mittels Helium gefüllter Ballons in den Nachthimmel gezogen werden, wo sie keine Gefahr für die Zuschauer bilden und ein Feuerwerk nicht durch Blendungseffekte stören. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 13/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 13/20 (2006.01); G09F 17/00 (2006.01); G09F 19/12 (2006.01); G09F 21/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 13/20 (2013.01); G09F 17/00 (2013.01); G09F 19/12 (2013.01); G09F 21/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29914455 U1 19991223; EP 1079358 A2 20010228; EP 1079358 A3 20010912

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-07-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 09F 13/20 A, 7G 09F 17/00 B, 7G 09F 21/12 B

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI